ME LD1030 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Substance Use Disorder Services Commission
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Governing the Substance Use Disorder Services Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Anne Perry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-18 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-295), in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-295) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-21 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-295). |
2019-05-21 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-21 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-02-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |