ME LD1030 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Sent to the Engrossing Department.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Sent to the Engrossing Department.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Health Insurance Coverage for Covered Services Provided by Naturopathic Doctors
Title
An Act To Require Health Insurance Coverage for Covered Services Provided by Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #528 (Y: 135 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #538 (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #538 (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Sent to the Engrossing Department. |
2018-03-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-22 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 528V 135 having voted in the affirmative and 11 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2018-03-22 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-03-20 | Senate | LD 1030 In Senate, March 20, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 32 IN FAVOR and 2 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-02-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-02-22 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-363). |
2018-02-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2018-02-22 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-363) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-363) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-02-20 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-03-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |