ME LD1023 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Definition of "Serious Bodily Injury" in the Maine Criminal Code
Title
An Act Regarding the Definition of "Serious Bodily Injury" in the Maine Criminal Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2020-03-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-03-12 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to INDEFINITELY POSTPONING the Bill and accompanying papers. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2020-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECALLED From Governor's Desk pursuant to Joint Order SP 629. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2019-06-19 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-116). |
2019-05-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-116). |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-116) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-02-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |