ME LD1019 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Increase the Maximum Pension Deduction for State Income Tax

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Increase the Maximum Pension Deduction for State Income Tax

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-10SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-10HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-10HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-07HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-07HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-230).
2019-06-07HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2019-06-07HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2019-06-07SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2019-06-07SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-230).
2019-06-07SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-230) READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-07SenateREAD ONCE.
2019-06-07SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2019-02-28HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-28HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION.
2019-02-28SenateCommittee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback