ME LD100 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish the General Election Date in United States Presidential Election Years as a State Holiday
Title
An Act To Establish the General Election Date in United States Presidential Election Years as a State Holiday
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | On motion of Representative MATLACK of St. George, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-03-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-03-10 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-02-24 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-02-24 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-11 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021. |