ME HP1524 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JOINT RESOLUTION RECOGNIZING APRIL 2, 2022 TO APRIL 8, 2022 AS THE WEEK OF THE YOUNG CHILD
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION RECOGNIZING APRIL 2, 2022 TO APRIL 8, 2022 AS THE WEEK OF THE YOUNG CHILD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | READ and ADOPTED. |
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?paper=HP1524&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1524&item=1&snum=130 |