ME HP1490 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING APPLICATION TO THE CONGRESS OF THE UNITED STATES CALLING A CONSTITUTIONAL CONVENTION TO PROPOSE A BALANCED BUDGET AMENDMENT
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING APPLICATION TO THE CONGRESS OF THE UNITED STATES CALLING A CONSTITUTIONAL CONVENTION TO PROPOSE A BALANCED BUDGET AMENDMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - Adoption (2/3) RC #345 (Y: 42 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2020-02-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 345 (Yeas 42 - Nays 86 - Absent 20 - Excused 1) - Vacant 2 |
2020-02-13 | House | Subsequently, the Joint Resolution FAILED ADOPTION |
2020-02-13 | House | Pursuant to Joint Rule 215.1, this Joint Resolution required the affirmative vote of two-thirds of those present for ADOPTION. |
2020-02-13 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2020-02-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2020-02-04 | House | Later today assigned. |
2020-02-04 | House | On motion of Representative DILLINGHAM of Oxford, TABLED pending ADOPTION. |
2020-02-04 | House | READ. |
2020-02-04 | House | Pursuant to Joint Rule 215.1, this Joint Resolution required the affirmative vote of two-thirds of those present for ADOPTION. |