ME HP1238 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Independent 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
Summary
JOINT RESOLUTION RECOGNIZING BRENDA COMMANDER ON THE COMPLETION OF AN UNPRECEDENTED 5TH TERM OF OFFICE AS CHIEF OF THE HOULTON BAND OF MALISEET INDIANS
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION RECOGNIZING BRENDA COMMANDER ON THE COMPLETION OF AN UNPRECEDENTED 5TH TERM OF OFFICE AS CHIEF OF THE HOULTON BAND OF MALISEET INDIANS
Sponsors
Rep. Henry John Bear [I] | Rep. Kent Ackley [I] | Rep. Owen Casas [I] | Rep. Ralph Chapman [D] |
Rep. Norman Higgins [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2018-03-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-15 | House | Subsequently, the Joint Resolution was ADOPTED. |
2018-03-15 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2018-03-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-01-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-01-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-01-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-01-23 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-01-23 | House | On motion of Representative BEAR of the Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians, TABLED pending ADOPTION. |
2018-01-23 | House | READ. |