ME HP1232 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING APPLICATION TO THE CONGRESS OF THE UNITED STATES CALLING A CONSTITUTIONAL CONVENTION UNDER ARTICLE V OF THE UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION LIMITED TO PROPOSING AN AMENDMENT TO THE UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION TO IMPOSE CONGRESSIONAL TERM LIMITS
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING APPLICATION TO THE CONGRESS OF THE UNITED STATES CALLING A CONSTITUTIONAL CONVENTION UNDER ARTICLE V OF THE UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION LIMITED TO PROPOSING AN AMENDMENT TO THE UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION TO IMPOSE CONGRESSIONAL TERM LIMITS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Accept Min Otp Rpt RC #546 (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #525 (Y: 83 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #525 (Y: 83 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Subsequently 2/3 Vote Required ADOPTION FAILED |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 546 Yeas 17 - Nays 16 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Minority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reports READ |
2018-03-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 525 (Yeas 83 - Nays 60 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2018-03-20 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-03-20 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2018-03-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2018-03-15 | House | Later today assigned. |
2018-03-15 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2018-03-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | READ and REFERRED to the Committee on State and Local Government, in concurrence. |
2018-01-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-16 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Joint Resolution was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2018-01-16 | House | The Joint Resolution was READ. |