ME HP1184 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 266 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0

Summary

JOINT RESOLUTION MEMORIALIZING THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES AND THE UNITED STATES CONGRESS TO ALLOW THE IMPORTATION OF AFFORDABLE AND SAFE PRESCRIPTION DRUGS

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JOINT RESOLUTION MEMORIALIZING THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES AND THE UNITED STATES CONGRESS TO ALLOW THE IMPORTATION OF AFFORDABLE AND SAFE PRESCRIPTION DRUGS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #266 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 266 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-11SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With READ and ADOPTED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-364) in concurrence
2019-06-11SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-10SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-07SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-06SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-05SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-04SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-03SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-30SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-30SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION
2019-05-29HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-29HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2019-05-29HouseSubsequently, the Joint Resolution was ADOPTED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-364).
2019-05-29HouseSubsequently, on further motion of same Representative House Amendment "A" (H-364) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-29HouseOn motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the House RECEDED.
2019-05-29HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2019-05-28HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-23HouseUnfinished Business
2019-05-23HouseLater today assigned.
2019-05-23HouseOn motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION.
2019-05-21SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-05-21SenateOn motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin JOINT RESOLUTION and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2019-05-21SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-05-16SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-14SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-09SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-08SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-07SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-02SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-02SenateOn motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION
2019-05-02SenateREAD
2019-04-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-30HouseREAD and ADOPTED.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback