ME HP0963 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-03 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JOINT RESOLUTION MEMORIALIZING THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES AND THE CONGRESS OF THE UNITED STATES TO PROVIDE TO THE HOULTON BAND OF MALISEET INDIANS JUST AND EQUITABLE COMPENSATION COMPARABLE TO THE SETTLEMENT PROVIDED TO THE PENOBSCOT NATION AND THE PASSAMAQUODDY TRIBE
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION MEMORIALIZING THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES AND THE CONGRESS OF THE UNITED STATES TO PROVIDE TO THE HOULTON BAND OF MALISEET INDIANS JUST AND EQUITABLE COMPENSATION COMPARABLE TO THE SETTLEMENT PROVIDED TO THE PENOBSCOT NATION AND THE PASSAMAQUODDY TRIBE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-03 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2013-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator VALENTINO of York, Joint Resolution and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, Reports READ |
2013-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-03 | House | Subsequently, the Joint Resolution and all accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2013-06-03 | House | Less than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was not ordered. |
2013-06-03 | House | Representative JONES of Freedom REQUESTED a Roll Call. |
2013-06-03 | House | Representative BEAR of the Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians MOVED to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the Joint Resolution and accompanying papers. |
2013-06-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | READ and REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2013-04-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-10 | House | On motion of Representative BEAR of the Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians, the Joint Resolution was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2013-04-10 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-04-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-04-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-04-04 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-04-04 | House | On motion of Representative BEAR of the Houlton Band of Maliseet Indians, TABLED pending ADOPTION. |
2013-04-04 | House | READ. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?paper=HP0963&snum=126 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0963&item=1&snum=126 |