ME HP0438 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING APPLICATION TO THE CONGRESS OF THE UNITED STATES CALLING AN ARTICLE V CONSTITUTIONAL CONVENTION TO PROPOSE AN AMENDMENT TO THE UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION TO IMPOSE CONGRESSIONAL TERM LIMITS
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING APPLICATION TO THE CONGRESS OF THE UNITED STATES CALLING AN ARTICLE V CONSTITUTIONAL CONVENTION TO PROPOSE AN AMENDMENT TO THE UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION TO IMPOSE CONGRESSIONAL TERM LIMITS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #176 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #66 (Y: 80 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #66 (Y: 80 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 176 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 66 (Yeas 80 - Nays 61 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) |
2021-05-19 | House | On motion of Representative MATLACK of St. George, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-05-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | READ and REFERRED to the Committee on State and Local Government, in concurrence. |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | On motion of Representative WADSWORTH of Hiram, the Joint Resolution was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2021-03-10 | House | READ. |