MD SJ9 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the Resolution of the General Assembly Compensation Commission dated January 16, 2018, and transmitted to the General Assembly on January 23, 2018, be amended to close the Legislative Pension Plan to new membership on or after January 9, 2019, and be amended to provide that no new service credit may be earned in the Legislative Pension Plan on or after January 9, 2019; etc.
Title
General Assembly Compensation Commission - Legislative Pension Plan - Closure to Current and Future Members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SJ0009?ys=2018rs |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sj/sj0009f.pdf |