MD SJ7 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sharp disagreement of the General Assembly of Maryland with the repeal of the Affordable Care Act; urging the U.S. Congress to promptly protect provisions of the federal Affordable Care Act that ensure all Marylanders have access to affordable health insurance coverage, free from discriminatory rates and policies; urging the Governor of Maryland to join in urging the U.S. congress to promptly protect specified provisions of the federal Affordable Care Act; etc.
Title
Protection of the Federal Affordable Care Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-03-24 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-14) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Congress, U.S.
Discrimination
Federal Government
General Assembly
Governor
Health
Health Insurance
Prices
Public Health
State Government - General Assembly
Discrimination
Federal Government
General Assembly
Governor
Health
Health Insurance
Prices
Public Health
State Government - General Assembly