MD SJ5 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Emphasizing the General Assembly's support, and urging the support, of female monthly cycle tracking education for adolescent girls; and encouraging the State Board of Education to update the comprehensive health education program to include certain standards for instruction on female monthly cycle tracking for adolescent girls.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive Health Education Program – Female Monthly Cycle Tracking for Adolescent Girls

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateWithdrawn by Sponsor
2021-02-09SenateHearing canceled
2021-01-21SenateHearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-15SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback