MD SJ4 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SJ3

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Opposing certain inspection rules promulgated by the U.S. Department of Agriculture that have drastically impeded the harvest and sale of blue catfish and thus rendered the State unable to adequately use the commercial harvest as a form of control over the invasive blue catfish species; urging the U.S. Congress to amend 21 U.S.C. § 601(w) to exempt the wild catch of domestic catfish from certain inspection requirements; and requiring a copy of the Resolution to be forwarded to certain elected officials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2021-04-10HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-08HouseFavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2021-04-05HouseHearing 4/06 at 9:45 a.m.
2021-04-05HouseHearing canceled
2021-04-05HouseHearing 4/06 at 9:30 a.m.
2021-02-05HouseReferred Rules and Executive Nominations
2021-02-03SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-01-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-01-29SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-01-29SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-12-29SenateHearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-09-25SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HJ1 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Referred Rules
SJ3 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback