MD SJ3 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Opposing certain inspection rules promulgated by the U.S. Department of Agriculture that have drastically impeded the harvest and sale of blue catfish and thus rendered the State unable to adequately use the commercial harvest as a form of control over the invasive blue catfish species; urging the U.S. Congress to amend 21 U.S.C. § 601(w) to exempt the wild catch of domestic catfish from certain inspection requirements; and requiring a copy of the Resolution to be forwarded to certain elected officials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources – Fishing – Wild–Caught Blue Catfish

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReferred Rules and Executive Nominations
2020-03-11SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2020-03-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-09SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-06SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-31SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HJ3 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/24 at 2:00 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback