MD SJ11 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 11:30 a.m.
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing the strong and unequivocal opposition of the General Assembly of Maryland to the draft proposed National Outer Continental Shelf Oil and Gas Leasing Program for 2019-2024, and the implementation of any offshore oil or gas leasing, exploration, development, or production in the Atlantic Ocean; urging the Secretary of the Interior of the United States to remove Maryland from the proposed leasing program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coastal Area - Protection From Offshore Oil and Gas Drilling

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30HouseHearing 3/30 at 11:30 a.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-16SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-13SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-23SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-21SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback