MD SB999 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-15 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-15 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 to alter the purpose of a grant for a specified recreational center to allow the funds to be used for the Annapolis City Hall; extending the deadline to June 1, 2014, for the Mayor and City Council of the City of Annapolis to present evidence of a matching fund; extending the deadline to June 1, 2014, for specified funds to be expended or encumbered; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Recreational Center at 9 St. Mary's Street
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2013-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Annapolis
Anne Arundel County
Community Facilities and Services
Prior Authorizations
Sports and Recreation
State Bonds
Anne Arundel County
Community Facilities and Services
Prior Authorizations
Sports and Recreation
State Bonds