MD SB997 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing from $10,000 to $25,000 the maximum amount of compensatory damages that may be awarded to an owner of a pet from a person who tortiously causes an injury to or death of the pet while acting individually or through an animal under the person's ownership, direction, or control.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil Actions - Tortious Injury to or Death of Pet - Compensatory Damages (Buddy's Law)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB992 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings11110(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback