MD SB996 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a tax sale of certain property if the tax has been in arrears for at least 5 years, subject to certain exceptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax - Property - Tax Sales

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03SenateHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2020-02-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Same As/Similar To

HB657 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - Property14808(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property14811(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback