MD SB996 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that July 27 each year is Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day in recognition of the service and sacrifice of Korean War veterans.
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Veterans
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Veterans