MD SB989 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the court to impose, on a person convicted of a hate crime, a requirement to attend an anti-bias education program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Penalty (Educate Against Hate Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseReferred Judiciary
2020-03-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2020-03-10SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10SenateFavorable with Amendments {478777/1 Adopted
2020-03-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB485 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-24 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Law10304(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law10305(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law10306(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback