MD SB988 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 325
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the circumstances under which certain entities are required to provide coverage for certain expenses arising from in vitro fertilization procedures; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 102 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 325
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (102-29)
2020-03-14HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-03-06HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2020-03-05SenateThird Reading Passed (35-12)
2020-03-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {397173/1 Adopted
2020-03-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-02-04SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB781 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 324

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance15810(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback