MD SB987 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Racing Commission to establish the Equine Health, Safety, and Welfare Advisory Committee; requiring the owner of Bowie Race Course Training Center to convey the property to the City of Bowie in a certain manner; authorizing, subject to the approval of the Board of Public Works, the Maryland Stadium Authority to issue up to $375,000,000 of bonds for the redevelopment of certain racing facilities; requiring the Authority, before issuing certain bonds, to ensure certain agreements are executed; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Racing and Community Development Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 113 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (Y: 118 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
2020-03-18SenatePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (113-14)
2020-03-18HouseConference Committee Report {763528/1 Adopted
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2020-03-18SenateConference Committee Report {763528/1 Adopted
2020-03-17SenateHouse Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Kaiser, Buckel and jackson01)
2020-03-17SenateHouse Refuses Recede
2020-03-17SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Guzzone, Griffith and McCray)
2020-03-17SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2020-03-17SenateSenate Refuses Concur House Amendments
2020-03-17HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Kaiser, Buckel and jackson01)
2020-03-17HouseHouse Refuses Recede
2020-03-17HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Guzzone, Griffith and McCray)
2020-03-17HouseSenate Requests House Recede
2020-03-17HouseSenate Refuses Concur House Amendments
2020-03-16SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Guzzone, Griffith and McCray)
2020-03-16SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2020-03-16SenateSenate Refuses Concur House Amendments
2020-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (112-15)
2020-03-16HouseMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (118-10)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {385660/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-03-15HouseHearing canceled (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
2020-03-11HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
2020-03-11HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
2020-03-10HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2020-03-06HouseReferred Ways and Means Appropriations
2020-03-06SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2020-03-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-04SenateFavorable as Amended Adopted
2020-03-04SenateFloor Committee Amendment {939833/1 Adopted
2020-03-03SenateMotion Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2020-03-03SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2020-03-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {259830/1
2020-03-02SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
2020-03-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {259830/1
2020-03-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-02-24SenateHearing 2/25 at 2:30 p.m.
2020-02-24SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-06SenateHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects

Administrative Agencies
Advertising
Agriculture
Animals
Anne Arundel County
Appropriations
Architects
Associations
Baltimore City
Bonds
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Community Facilities and Services
Construction
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
Engineers
Environmental Health
Equipment
Fees
Flood Control
Forests and Parks
Gaming
Grants
Health
Heating and Cooling
Highways
Horse Racing
Housing
Landscape Architects
Liability
Licenses
Lottery
Museums
Notices
Parking
Partnerships
Personal Property
Plumbing
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Public Officials
Public Works
Public Works, Board of
Racing
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Sewage
Sidewalks
Signs and Billboards
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
State Universities and Colleges
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Transportation
Utilities
Water
Weather
Worcester County
Zoning and Planning

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Regulation11209(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation11213(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation11511(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation11519(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation11520(n/a)See Bill Text
Business Regulation11521(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10601(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10620(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10628(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10646.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10657.2(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10657.3(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government9120(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-09(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-27(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-28(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-29(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-31(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10207(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General10307(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11236(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property12108(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property13207(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property13410(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property7246(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0987?ys=2020RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0987f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0987t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0987e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0987_25983001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0987_93983301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0987_38566001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0987_76352801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/sb0987_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0520.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0854.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0855.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/1017.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/1217.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback