MD SB985 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that certain provisions of law relating to the confidentiality of juvenile police records and court records do not prohibit access to and confidential use of certain records concerning a child by the Baltimore City Mayor's Office on Criminal Justice if the Office is providing services to the child; specifying that the Baltimore City Mayor's Office on Criminal Justice shall be liable for the unauthorized release of a police record it accesses under the Act; etc.
Title
Confidentiality of Juvenile Records - Baltimore City Mayor's Office on Criminal Justice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-29 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2019-03-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-18 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Baltimore City
Courts
Disclosure
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Law Enforcement
Liability
Privacy
Records
Sunset
Baltimore City
Courts
Disclosure
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Law Enforcement
Liability
Privacy
Records
Sunset