MD SB982 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, beginning in fiscal year 2020, the amounts of capital grants calculated based on highway user revenues that are required to be appropriated to Baltimore City, counties, and municipalities in certain fiscal years; etc.
Title
Highway User Revenues – Distribution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {299631/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1394 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Fuel
Grants
Highways
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Fuel
Grants
Highways
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 8 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |