MD SB982 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain distributor of controlled dangerous substances to report certain suspicious orders to the Maryland Department of Health and the Office of the Attorney General; authorizing a certain distributor to satisfy a certain reporting obligation by providing to the Department and the Office of the Attorney General copies of certain reports; and requiring that the Department and the Office of the Attorney General maintain certain reports confidentially, with a certain exception.
Title
Controlled Dangerous Substances - Distributors - Reporting Suspicious Orders
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Miller [D] | Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Wayne Norman [R] | Sen. Victor Ramirez [D] | Sen. William Smith [D] |
Sen. Robert Zirkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 593 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {118477/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Attorney General
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Dealers
Disclosure
Health, Department of
Privacy
Public Health
Public Safety
Reports
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Dealers
Disclosure
Health, Department of
Privacy
Public Health
Public Safety
Reports