MD SB981 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Workgroup to Study Long-Term Care Medicaid Eligibility and Payments to Providers; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Workgroup to submit an interim and a final report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020, and June 30, 2021, respectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workgroup to Study Long-Term Care Medicaid Eligibility and Payments to Providers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateHearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-17SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB977 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-14 - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback