MD SB980 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the election of the board of directors of a credit union to be conducted electronically under specified circumstances; requiring the secretary of a credit union, for an election of directors conducted electronically, to provide specified information and a specified identification form to each member of the credit union in good standing as provided in regulations adopted by the Commissioner of Financial Regulation; requiring the Commissioner to establish specified regulations; etc.
Title
Credit Unions - Boards of Directors - Electronically Conducted Elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-27 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-14 | Re-referred Finance | |
2011-03-09 | Referred Senate Rules | |
2011-03-09 | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Middleton) Adopted | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Ballots
Committees and Commissions
Credit Unions
Elections
Electronic Commerce
Financial Regulation, Division of
Forms
Identification
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Committees and Commissions
Credit Unions
Elections
Electronic Commerce
Financial Regulation, Division of
Forms
Identification
Notices
Rules and Regulations