MD SB978 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the termination date to June 30, 2021, for certain provisions establishing that, unless a deed expressly provides otherwise, the grant of a certain agricultural land preservation easement governing certain parcels of land does not consolidate the parcels for any other purpose, and that a certain parcel subject to a certain easement may be conveyed separately to a certain child with certain approval of the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation, but remains subject to the easement in perpetuity; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Separate Parcels

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-25SenateHearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-18SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback