MD SB978 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 695
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 695
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a student or a student's parent or guardian to release the student's Armed Services Vocational Aptitude Battery score to certain apprenticeship programs and certain employers; authorizing the State Department of Education to adopt regulations requiring the award of credit toward high school graduation for time spent in certain apprenticeship programs; authorizing a Workforce Development Sequence Scholarship to assist with the cost of participation in certain apprenticeship programs; etc.
Title
Career Preparation Expansion Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-12) (Y: 124 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-12) (Y: 124 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 695 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (123-12) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {163696/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {824339/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Apprentices
Armed Forces
Committees and Commissions
Credit
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Education, State Department of
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment
Apprentices
Armed Forces
Committees and Commissions
Credit
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Education, State Department of
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment