MD SB977 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reducing the State income tax rate imposed on certain income of certain individuals; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax Rates - Reduction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2019-02-18SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback