MD SB977 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Director of the Behavioral Health Administration by December 1 each year to submit a report on behavioral health services for children and young adults in the State to the Governor and the General Assembly; requiring the Social Services Administration by December 1 each year to submit a report on voluntary placement agreements for children and young adults in the State to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements - Children and Young Adults - Reports

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-30HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-27HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments {487577/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-02-21SenateHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback