MD SB974 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor to appropriate at least $1,000,000 in fiscal year 2020, and each fiscal year thereafter, in addition to the Governor's appropriation in the State budget to the Office of the Attorney General, to be used for certain purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government - Office of the Attorney General - Appropriation and Staffing (Judicial Use, Spending, Trial, Investigation, and Constitutional Errata (JUSTICE) Act of 2018)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateHearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-03-07SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-08SenateHearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
2018-03-06SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-08SenateHearing 3/08 at 2:45 p.m.
2018-02-28SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-07SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback