MD SB973 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-31 - Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-31 - Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering findings and policies regarding the creation of the Division of Pretrial Detention and Services; requiring the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services, on or before May 1, 2015, with the advice of the Pretrial Services Commission to establish a Pretrial Release Services Program in the Department to offer in each county an alternative to pretrial detention; establishing requirements for the program; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Frosh [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-9) (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {493321/2 Rejected (14-31) (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Zirkin) {513020/2 Rejected (9-37) (Y: 9 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Zirkin) Rejected (18-28) (Y: 18 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {493321/2 Rejected (14-31) (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Zirkin) {513020/2 Rejected (9-37) (Y: 9 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Zirkin) Rejected (18-28) (Y: 18 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-9) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {493321/2 Rejected (14-31) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {513020/2 Rejected (9-37) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) {543820/2 Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Miller) {193723/2 Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) {753223/1 Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {943721/2 Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Zirkin) Rejected (18-28) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Getty) Adopted |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {248075/1 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {248075/1 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Re-Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 Adopted |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Arrests
Bail
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
District Courts
Electronic Government
Evidence
Judges
Legal Aid
Local Government Mandates
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners
Privacy
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Aid
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Trials
Witnesses
Appropriations
Arrests
Bail
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disclosure
District Courts
Electronic Government
Evidence
Judges
Legal Aid
Local Government Mandates
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners
Privacy
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Aid
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Trials
Witnesses