MD SB972 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing obsolete and redundant language in, clarifying language in, and reorganizing certain provisions of law governing the State Board of Physicians and the regulation of physicians, physician assistants, and allied health professionals; authorizing the Board to regulate the allied health committees; and repealing the requirement that the Board provide a certain data sheet.
Title
Physicians and Allied Health Professions – Reorganization and Revisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1252 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-21 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Disclosure
Equipment
Evidence
Fees
Fines
Health Occupations
Home Care Services
Investigations and Inquiries
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Public Information
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Disclosure
Equipment
Evidence
Fees
Fines
Health Occupations
Home Care Services
Investigations and Inquiries
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Public Information
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0972?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0972f.pdf |