MD SB972 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing provisions of law establishing and relating to the Civilian Review Board of Baltimore City; establishing the Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City; specifying the purpose of the Commission; providing for the composition, chair, voting, terms, powers, duties, staffing, procedures, and reporting of the Commission; establishing certain requirements for members of the Commission; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
2020-03-10SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-06SenateHearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety3104(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety3110(n/a)See Bill Text
Baltimore City1641(n/a)See Bill Text
Baltimore City1642(n/a)See Bill Text
Baltimore City1643(n/a)See Bill Text
Baltimore City1644(n/a)See Bill Text
Baltimore City1645(n/a)See Bill Text
Baltimore City1646(n/a)See Bill Text
Baltimore City1647(n/a)See Bill Text
Baltimore City1648(n/a)See Bill Text
Baltimore City1649(n/a)See Bill Text
Baltimore City1650(n/a)See Bill Text
Baltimore City1651(n/a)See Bill Text
Baltimore City1652(n/a)See Bill Text
Baltimore City1653(n/a)See Bill Text
Baltimore City1654(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback