MD SB972 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force on Educational Outcomes of Pregnant and Parenting Students in High School and GED Programs; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to track and assess, identify, determine, and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the State Board of Education and the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2021; terminating the Act after June 30, 2021; etc.
Title
Task Force on Educational Outcomes of Pregnant and Parenting Students in High School and GED Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-18 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Child Care
Committees and Commissions
Data
Education
Education, State Department of
Parents and Guardians
Pregnancy
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Public Schools
Reports
Students
Sunset
Transportation
Committees and Commissions
Data
Education
Education, State Department of
Parents and Guardians
Pregnancy
Primary and Secondary Education
Privacy
Public Schools
Reports
Students
Sunset
Transportation