MD SB970 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the amount of certain fees and fines that may be imposed by the State Ethics Commission for certain purposes; altering a certain requirement for a certain official to disclose the acceptance of certain tickets or free admission to certain events on a financial disclosure statement; requiring each member of the General Assembly to submit a certain annual notice regarding a certain meeting with the Ethics Counsel to the presiding officers of the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Ethics - Disclosures and Fines and Penalties - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-13HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2020-03-13SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-11SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments {354135/1 Adopted
2020-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
General Provisions5405(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions5607(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions5902(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions5903(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government2709(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback