MD SB97 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain provisions and procedures relating to the clerks of the circuit courts, including the execution of certain bonds and the issuance of certain licenses.
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts – Bonds, Licenses, Oaths, and Commissions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {473924/1 Adopted |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB205 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Subjects
Bonds
Clerks of Court
Comptroller
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Fees
Licenses
Oaths
Public Officials
Clerks of Court
Comptroller
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Fees
Licenses
Oaths
Public Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 2 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 2 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 2 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |