MD SB97 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration, in cooperation with certain stakeholders, to develop and implement a Purple Line marketing plan designed to generate early interest in and promote use of the Purple Line; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill $500,000 from the Transportation Trust Fund for the marketing plan in a certain fiscal year; requiring the Administration, by October 1, 2023, at the latest, to submit a certain report to certain standing committees of the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Purple Line Marketing Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (31-15)
2021-04-12SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (98-41)
2021-04-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {624367/1 Adopted
2021-04-10HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2021-03-22HouseHearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
2021-03-22HouseHearing canceled (Appropriations)
2021-03-20HouseHearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
2021-03-20HouseReferred Appropriations Environment and Transportation
2021-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (33-12)
2021-03-19SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {707877/1 Adopted
2021-03-18SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {707877/1
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-12-23SenateHearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Finance
2020-10-31SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation7713(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0097?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0097f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0097t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0097e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0097_70787701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0097_62436701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0097_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0097_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0097_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0603.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1410.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1230.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback