MD SB969 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that certain regulations adopted by the Maryland Department of Health relating to assisted living programs include requiring an assisted living program to complete a certain assessment tool within a certain period of time and requiring a certain program manager to invite certain individuals to participate in certain resident assessments; requiring that certain assisted living programs have certain staff-to-resident ratios at certain assisted living program facilities under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Regulations, Staffing, and Training

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2020-03-02SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-07SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB1063 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General191805(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General191805.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General191807(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback