MD SB969 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Human Services to allow an applicant for or recipient of assistance under the Family Investment Program to meet a work activity requirement by participating in a minimum of 20 hours per week of vocational educational training that leads to an associate degree, a diploma, or a certificate or an average of at least 20 hours per weeks of education directly related to employment; requiring the Department to report certain information to the General Assembly by October 1 each year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Investment Program – Work Activity Requirement – Authorized Activities and Report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-04-08HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-04-08HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {797475/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-04-04SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-18SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback