MD SB967 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing an additional 5% tax credit for certain expenditures under the Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit for certain commercial rehabilitations that qualify as affordable housing; requiring that the amount of an expired or unclaimed initial credit certificate remain in a certain Reserve Fund and increase the amount of initial credit certificates that the Maryland Historical Trust may issue for the following fiscal year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Title
Heritage Structure Rehabilitation Tax Credit - Commercial Rehabilitations - Affordable Housing
Sponsors
Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] |
Sen. Ronald Young [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] | Sen. Anthony Muse [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (110-27) (Y: 111 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (110-27) (Y: 111 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-26 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (110-27) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {585860/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {609032/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Commercial Rehabilitation
Historical Matters
Housing
Income Tax
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Historical Matters
Housing
Income Tax
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income