MD SB966 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that a certain violation of a certain provision of law shall be a violation of the Consumer Protection Act; prohibiting a person from knowingly and willfully referring another person to a certain assisted living program; establishing certain penalties for certain violations of the Act; requiring the Secretary of Health to remit certain penalties to the Office of Health Care Quality for a certain purpose; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Facilities - Assisted Living Programs - Referrals and Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-03-16HouseHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-16HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {837678/1 Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-02-07SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB1615 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-19 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General191804.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General191809(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General191813(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback