MD SB966 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the Public Service Commission has oversight responsibility over specified expenditures of the electric universal service program; requiring the Department of Human Resources to expend specified funds collected for the program in specified fiscal years for specified purposes, including bill assistance and arrearage retirement, targeted weatherization, or arrearage management; and stating the intent of the General Assembly regarding the timing for expending specified unexpended bill assistance and arrearage funds.
Title
Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-6) (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-6) (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Senate | Veto sustained (0-44) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-6) |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {433392/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {637475/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Debt Collection
General Assembly
Human Resources, Department of
Public Service Commission
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weather
Welfare
Debt Collection
General Assembly
Human Resources, Department of
Public Service Commission
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weather
Welfare