MD SB965 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State, in a criminal case involving the unlawful possession of specified firearms, to appeal from a decision of a trial court that excludes evidence offered by the State or requires the return of property alleged to have been seized in violation of specified constitutional provisions.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Right of Appeal - Unlawful Possession of Regulated Firearm, Rifle, or Shotgun
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {408178/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |