MD SB964 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Maryland Department of Agriculture from certifying and registering a site that will be used to grow or cultivate hemp under the Hemp Research Pilot Program if the area on which the hemp will be grown is located within 2 miles of a residential community with 10 or more residences; and prohibiting the Department from issuing a license to a person to produce hemp in the State if the area on which the hemp will be produced is located within 2 miles of a residential community with 10 or more residences.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production - Prohibitions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-05SenateHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB510 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Agriculture14202(n/a)See Bill Text
Agriculture14308(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback