MD SB961 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 169
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Applying certain sexual harassment prevention training requirements to each constituent institution of the University System of Maryland; and repealing the requirement that a certain representative designated by a unit of the University System of Maryland to coordinate certain sexual harassment prevention training be the unit's Title IX Coordinator.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Designated Coordinator - University System of Maryland

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 169
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2020-03-16HouseHearing canceled
2020-03-02HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-28HouseReferred Appropriations
2020-02-27SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-02-25SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-25SenateFavorable with Amendments {827274/1 Adopted
2020-02-24SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-02-07SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB325 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 168

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Personnel and Pensions2203(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions2203.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback